Docket for 16-593
No. 16-593 | |
Title: |
Self-Insurance Institute of America, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al. |
|
Docketed: | November 2, 2016 |
Linked with 16A260 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-2264) |
Decision Date: | July 1, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 12 2016 |
Application (16A260) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 29, 2016 to October 29, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Sep 13 2016 |
Application (16A260) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 29, 2016. |
Oct 31 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2016) |
Nov 18 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondents Rick Snyder, Governor of Michigan, et al. to respond filed. |
Nov 30 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Nov 30 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of The National Coordinating Committee for Multiemployer Plans filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|