Docket for 16-5876
No. 16-5876 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
William C. Sallie, Petitioner |
v. |
Eric Sellers, Warden |
|
Docketed: | September 7, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1289 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-13719) |
Decision Date: | September 29, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 28, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 15 2016 |
Application (15A1289) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 26, 2016 to August 25, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jun 27 2016 |
Application (15A1289) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 25, 2016. |
Aug 25 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 7, 2016) |
Oct 7 2016 |
Brief of respondent Eric Sellers, Warden in opposition filed. |
Oct 26 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2016. |
Oct 27 2016 |
Reply of petitioner William C. Sallie filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 14 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|