Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-536
No. 16-536
Title:
Stephen P. Howell, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 20, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(16-0289, 16-0367)
  Decision Date:July 19, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 17 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 21, 2016)
Nov 8 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Nov 15 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016.
Nov 23 2016 Response Requested . (Due December 23, 2016)
Dec 15 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 23, 2017.
Jan 12 2017 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 22, 2017.
Feb 22 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Mar 7 2017 Reply of petitioner Stephen P. Howell filed.
Mar 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 27 2017 Petition DENIED.
Apr 21 2017 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Apr 25 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
R. Andrew Austria 1254 Charles Morris St. SE202-685-7054
Suite 100
Washington, DC  20374-5124
drewaustria@gmail.com
Party name: Stephen P. Howell
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
July 21, 2017 | Version 2014.2