Docket for 16-5243
No. 16-5243 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Gregory P. Lawler, Petitioner |
v. |
Bruce Chatman, Warden |
|
Docketed: | July 18, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1112 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-12389) |
Decision Date: | December 10, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 8, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 25 2016 |
Application (15A1112) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2016 to July 7, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Apr 28 2016 |
Application (15A1112) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 7, 2016. |
Jul 7 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 17, 2016) |
Aug 17 2016 |
Brief of respondent Bruce Chatman, Warden in opposition filed. |
Sep 1 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|