Docket for 16-518
No. 16-518 | |
Title: |
Sharel Farmer, Petitioner |
v. |
Eagle Systems and Services, Incorporated, et al. |
|
Docketed: | October 17, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-1124) |
Decision Date: | July 1, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2016) |
Nov 16 2016 |
Brief of respondents Eagle Systems and Services, Incorporated, et al. in opposition filed. |
Nov 30 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|