Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-413
No. 16-413
Vide 16-283
Title:
Raymond Armstrong, et al., Petitioners
v.
National Football League, et al.
Docketed:September 29, 2016
Linked with 16A186
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-2272)
  Decision Date:April 18, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 18 2016 Application (16A186) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 30, 2016 to October 17, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito.
Aug 19 2016 Response to application from respondent Shawn Wooden, et al. filed.
Aug 22 2016 Application (16A186) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 19, 2016.
Sep 8 2016 Application (16A186) to extend further the time from September 19, 2016 to October 3, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito.
Sep 12 2016 Application (16A186) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 26, 2016. No further extensions will be granted for any reason.
Sep 26 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 31, 2016)
Oct 11 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 2, 2016.
Oct 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Brain Injury Association of America filed.
Oct 27 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 7, 2016.
Oct 31 2016 Brief amici curiae of 135 Former National Football League Players filed.
Oct 31 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed.
Nov 4 2016 Brief of respondents The National Football League and NFL Properties, LLC in opposition filed. VIDED.
Nov 4 2016 Brief of respondents Turner, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Nov 21 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016.
Nov 21 2016 Reply of petitioners Raymond Armstrong, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 22 2016 Supplemental brief of respondents Turner, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Dec 12 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Deepak Gupta Gupta Wessler PLLC(202) 888-1741
    Counsel of Record1735 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20009
deepak@guptawessler.com
Party name: Raymond Armstrong, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Paul D. Clement Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
paul.clement@kirkland.com
Party name: The National Football League and NFL Properties, LLC
 
Samuel Issacharoff 40 Washington Square South(212) 998-6580
    Counsel of RecordSuite 411J
New York, NY  10012
si13@nyu.edu
Party name: Turner, et al.
Other:
Steven L. Brannock Brannock & Humphries(813)-223-4300
1111 W. Cass Street, Suite 200
Tampa, FL  33606
sbrannock@bhappeals.com
Party name: 135 Former National Football League Players
 
Shana De Caro De Carlo & Kaplen, LLP914-747-4410
427 Bedford Road
Pleasantville, NY  10570
shana@brainlaw.com
Party name: Brain Injury Association of America
 
Scott L. Nelson Public Citizen Litigation Group(202) 588-1000
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20009
snelson@citizen.org
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
May 28, 2017 | Version 2014.2