Docket for 16-372
No. 16-372 | |
Title: |
SRM Global Master Fund Limited Partnership, Petitioner |
v. |
Bear Stearns Companies LLC, et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 22, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-507) |
Decision Date: | July 14, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 22 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2016) |
Oct 17 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 7, 2016. |
Nov 7 2016 |
Brief of respondents Bear Stearns Companies LLC, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Dec 7 2016 |
Reply of petitioner SRM Global Master Fund Limited Partnership filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 9 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017. |
Jun 26 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017. |
Jun 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|