Docket for 16-302
No. 16-302 | |
Title: |
The Geo Group, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 9, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-16081) |
Decision Date: | March 14, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 7, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 6 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2016) |
Sep 22 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 10, 2016. |
Nov 10 2016 |
Brief of respondent Equal Employment Opportunity Commission in opposition filed. |
Nov 29 2016 |
Reply of petitioner The Geo Group, Inc. filed. |
Nov 30 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|