~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 11 2016 |
Application (16A49) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 1, 2016 to August 31, 2016, submitted to Justice Breyer. |
Jul 13 2016 |
Application (16A49) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until August 31, 2016. |
Aug 31 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2016) |
Sep 14 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondents Backpage.com, LLC, et al. to respond filed. |
Sep 27 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Center for Missing and Exploited Children. |
Sep 28 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 14, 2016. |
Sep 28 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by FAIR Girls. (Distributed) |
Sep 29 2016 |
Response Requested . (Due October 31, 2016) |
Sep 29 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Coalition Against Trafficking Women, et al. |
Sep 29 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Professors Chad Flanders, et al. |
Sep 30 2016 |
Brief amici curiae of Washington, et al. filed. |
Oct 5 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Human Trafficking Institute, et al. |
Oct 25 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2016. |
Oct 27 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Legal Momentum, et al. |
Nov 30 2016 |
Brief of respondents Backpage.com, LLC, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 13 2016 |
Reply of petitioners Jane Doe No. 1, et al. filed. |
Dec 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Human Trafficking Institute, et al. GRANTED. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Center for Missing and Exploited Children GRANTED. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by FAIR Girls GRANTED. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Coalition Against Trafficking Women, et al. GRANTED. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Professors Chad Flanders, et al. GRANTED. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Legal Momentum, et al. GRANTED. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |