Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-209
No. 16-209
Title:
Djoulou K. Caldwell, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 15, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(16-0091)
  Decision Date:May 16, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 15 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2016)
Aug 23 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Aug 31 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Sep 12 2016 Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Sep 13 2016 Brief amici curiae of U.S. Army Trial Defense Service, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Scott Ashby Martin 9275 Gunston Road(703) 693-0725
    Counsel of RecordBuilding 1450
Fort Belvoir, VA  22060
scott.a.martin221.mil@mail.mil
Party name: Djoulou K. Caldwell
Attorneys for Respondent:
Ian Heath Gershengorn Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Eugene R. Fidell Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP(202) 466-8960
1129 20th St., N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC  20026
efidel@ftlf.com
Party name: Law Professors
 
Timothy Grammel U.S. Army Legal Services Agency(703) 693-0362
9275 Gunston Road, Building 1450
Fort Belvoir, VA  22060
timothy.grammel.civ@mail.mil
Party name: U.S. Army Trial Defense Service, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543