Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1532
No. 16-1532
Title:
Shaquille Montel Robinson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 22, 2017
Linked with 16A969
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-4902)
  Decision Date:January 23, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 7 2017 Application (16A969) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2017 to June 22, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 18 2017 Application (16A969) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 22, 2017.
Jun 22 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2017)
Jul 20 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jeffrey L. Fisher Stanford Law School(650) 724-7081
    Counsel of RecordSupreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA  94305-8610
jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
Party name: Shaquille Montel Robinson
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
July 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2