Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1423
No. 16-1423
Title:
Keanu D. W. Ortiz, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 30, 2017
Linked with 16A1034
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(16-0671)
  Decision Date:February 9, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 21 2017 Application (16A1034) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 10, 2017 to June 9, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 26 2017 Application (16A1034) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 9, 2017.
May 19 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 29, 2017)
Jun 26 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 31, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Stephen I. Vladeck 727 East Dean Keeton Street(512) 475-9198
    Counsel of RecordAustin, TX  78705
svladeck@law.utexas.edu
Party name: Keanu D. W. Ortiz
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
July 20, 2017 | Version 2014.2