Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-131
No. 16-131
Title:
United States, ex rel. Cause of Action, Petitioner
v.
Chicago Transit Authority
Docketed:July 27, 2016
Linked with 15A1239
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1143)
  Decision Date:February 29, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 6 2016 Application (15A1239) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2016 to July 27, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jun 6 2016 Application (15A1239) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 27, 2016.
Jul 27 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2016)
Sep 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Alfred J. Lechner Jr. Cause of Action Institute(202) 499-4232
    Counsel of Record1875 Eye Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC  20006
jlechner@causeofaction.org
Party name: Cause of Action

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543