Docket for 16-125
No. 16-125 | |
Title: |
Merck & Cie, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Gnosis S.p.A., et al. |
|
Docketed: | July 27, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-1779) |
Decision Date: | December 17, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 26, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 25 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2016) |
Aug 26 2016 |
Brief of respondents Gnosis S.p.A., et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 13 2016 |
Reply of petitioners Merck & Cie, et al. filed. |
Sep 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2016. |
Oct 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|