Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1185
No. 16-1185
Title:
United States, ex rel. Robert P. Bauchwitz, Petitioner
v.
William K. Holloman, et al.
Docketed:April 3, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(16-1669)
  Decision Date:November 29, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:December 28, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 27 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2017)
Apr 14 2017 Waiver of right of respondents William K. Holloman, et al. to respond filed.
Apr 20 2017 Waiver of right of respondents Thomas Jefferson University and Eric B. Kmeic, Ph.D. to respond filed.
May 2 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Ronald T. Tomasko JSDC Law Offices(717) 533-3280
    Counsel of Record134 Sipe Avenue
Hummelstown, PA  17036
RTT@jsdc.com
Party name: United States, ex rel. Robert P. Bauchwitz
Attorneys for Respondents:
James R. Kahn Office of University Counsel, Cornell University(212) 746-0463
    Counsel of Record445 East 69th Street, Suite #405
New York, NY  10021
jkahn@med.cornell.edu
Party name: William K. Holloman, et al.
 
Marc Stephen Raspanti Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP(215) 320-6200
    Counsel of Record1818 Market Street Suite 3402
Philadelphia, PA  19103
msr@pietragallo.com
Party name: Thomas Jefferson University and Eric B. Kmeic, Ph.D.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543