Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1181
No. 16-1181
Title:
Robert J. Jaffe, Petitioner
v.
John G. Roberts, Jr., Chief Justice, Supreme Court of the United States, et al.
Docketed:March 31, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-56328)
  Decision Date:May 18, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:August 24, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 14 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 1, 2017)
Nov 14 2016 Appendix of Robert J. Jaffe filed (3 Volumes).
May 1 2017 Waiver of right of respondents John G. Roberts, Jr., Chief Justice, Supreme Court of the United States, et al. to respond filed.
May 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 22 2017 Supplemental brief of petitioner Robert J. Jaffe filed. (Distributed)
May 30 2017 Because the Court lacks a quorum, 28 U. S. C. �1, and since the qualified Justices are of the opinion that the case cannot be heard and determined at the next Term of the Court, the judgment is affirmed under 28 U. S. C. �2109, which provides that under these circumstances �the court shall enter its order affirming the judgment of the court from which the case was brought for review with the same effect as upon affirmance by an equally divided court.� The Chief Justice, Justice Kennedy, Justice Thomas, Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, Justice Alito, Justice Sotomayor and Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Robert J. Jaffe 22139 Burbank Boulevard, Suite 5(818) 713-1378
Woodland Hills, CA  91367
Party name: Robert J. Jaffe
Attorneys for Respondents:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: John G. Roberts, Jr., Chief Justice, Supreme Court of the United States, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543