Docket for 16-1155
No. 16-1155 | |
Title: |
Frederick Miller, Petitioner |
v. |
Mary Stamm, Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl A. Stamm, IV |
|
Docketed: | March 23, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-1601) |
Decision Date: | September 16, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 19, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 20 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2017) |
Apr 20 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 23, 2017. |
May 15 2017 |
Brief of respondent Mary Stamm, Personal Representative of the Estate of Carl A. Stamm, IV in opposition filed. |
May 30 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|