Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15A742
No. 15A742
Title:
Hasan K. Akbar, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:January 15, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(13-7001)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 13 2016 Application (15A742) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 7, 2016 to April 7, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jan 15 2016 Application (15A742) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 7, 2016.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jennifer K. Beerman Captain, Judge Advocate(703) 693-0651
    Counsel of Record U.S. Army Legal Services Agency,
Defense Appellate Division
9275 Gunston Road
Fort Belvoir, VA  22060
Party name: Hasan K. Akbar
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543