Docket for 15-9411
No. 15-9411 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jason Dean, Petitioner |
v. |
Ohio |
|
Docketed: | May 20, 2016 |
Linked with 15A994 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Ohio |
Case Nos.: | (2011-2005) |
Decision Date: | October 27, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 20, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 21 2016 |
Application (15A994) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 19, 2016 to May 19, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Mar 29 2016 |
Application (15A994) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 19, 2016. |
May 17 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 20, 2016) |
Jun 16 2016 |
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed. |
Jun 30 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|