Docket for 15-889
No. 15-889 | |
Title: |
Jermaine Amani Thomas, aka Jermaine Thomas, Petitioner |
v. |
Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General |
|
Docketed: | January 14, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-60297) |
Decision Date: | August 7, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 14, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 12 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2016) |
Jan 27 2016 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. |
Jan 27 2016 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner |
Feb 16 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Texas Legal Services Center filed. |
Feb 16 2016 |
Brief amici curiae of Certain Members of Congress filed. |
Feb 16 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. filed. |
Feb 17 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 17, 2016. |
Mar 14 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 18, 2016. |
Apr 13 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 18, 2016. |
May 18 2016 |
Brief of respondent Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General in opposition filed. |
Jun 2 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Jermaine Amani Thomas, aka Jermaine Thomas filed. |
Jun 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016. |
Jun 27 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Charles Randall Flores |
1221 McKinney St. | (713)-951-3700 |
Counsel of Record | Suite 4500 | |
| Houston, TX 77010 | |
| cflores@beckredden.com |
Party name: Jermaine Amani Thomas, aka Jermaine Thomas |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. |
Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record |
United States Department of Justice | |
| 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20530-0001 | |
| SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov |
Party name: Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General |
Other: | | |
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald |
McGuireWoods LLP | (804) 775-4716 |
| 901 East Canal Street | |
| Richmond, VA 23219 | |
| mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com |
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. |
| | |
Sean D. Jordan |
Jackson Walker, LLP | (512) 236-2281 |
| 100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1100 | |
| Austin, TX 78701 | |
| sjordan@jw.com |
Party name: Certain Members of Congress |
| | |
Michael K. Oldham |
Reynolds, Frizzell, Black, Doyle, Allen & Oldham, LLP | (713) 485-7200 |
| 1100 Louisiana, Suite 3500 | |
| Houston, TX 77002 | |
| oldham&reynoldsfrizzell.com |
Party name: Texas Legal Services Center |