~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 21 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2016) |
Jan 11 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Nancy Brown to respond filed. |
Jan 22 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of The International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. |
Feb 10 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 26, 2016. |
Feb 17 2016 |
Response Requested . (Due March 18, 2016) |
Mar 18 2016 |
Brief of respondent Nancy Brown in opposition filed. |
Mar 31 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Wayne Blanchard filed. |
Apr 6 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016. |
Apr 25 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |