~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 16 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2015) |
Dec 1 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Dec 9 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Dec 14 2015 |
Brief amicus curiae of US Army Defense Appellate Division filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 21 2015 |
Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed. (Distributed). |
Dec 30 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due January 29, 2016) |
Jan 21 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 29, 2016. |
Feb 17 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 30, 2016. |
Mar 10 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 29, 2016. |
Apr 22 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 27, 2016. |
May 27 2016 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Jun 8 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Michael E. Sullivan filed. |
Jun 14 2016 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Michael E. Sullivan filed. |
Jun 15 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |