~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 29 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 18, 2015) |
Dec 3 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until February 1, 2016, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. |
Jan 15 2016 |
Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner. |
Jan 21 2016 |
Application (15A780) for an extension of time within which to comply with the order of January 11, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jan 28 2016 |
Application (15A780) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 1, 2016. |
Feb 3 2016 |
Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED. |
Mar 7 2016 |
Petitioner complied with order of January 11, 2016. |
Mar 17 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 1, 2016. |
Apr 4 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
Apr 5 2016 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
May 17 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016. |
Jun 6 2016 |
Rehearing DENIED. |