Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-643
No. 15-643
Title:
Joseph M. Arpaio, Sheriff, Maricopa County, Arizona, Petitioner
v.
Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al.
Docketed:November 16, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-5325)
  Decision Date:August 14, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 12 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2015)
Dec 7 2015 Letter from counsel for petitioner Joseph M. Arpaio, Sheriff, Maricopa County, Arizona filed.
Dec 15 2015 Brief of respondents Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 30 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Dec 30 2015 Reply of petitioner Joseph M. Arpaio, Sheriff, Maricopa County, Arizona filed. (Distributed)
Jan 19 2016 Petition DENIED.
Jan 29 2016 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Feb 10 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 26, 2016.
Feb 29 2016 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Larry Klayman Freedom Watch, Inc.(310) 595-0800
    Counsel of Record2020 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 345
Washington, DC  20006
leklayman@gmail.com
Party name: Joseph M. Arpaio, Sheriff, Maricopa County, Arizona
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al.
July 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2