Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-405
No. 15-405
Title:
Joshua Katso, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 1, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(14-5008)
  Decision Date:June 30, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 25 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2015)
Oct 28 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 2, 2015.
Nov 25 2015 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 4, 2016.
Jan 5 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 3, 2016.
Feb 2 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 26, 2016.
Feb 26 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Mar 10 2016 Reply of petitioner Joshua Katso filed.
Mar 16 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 1, 2016.
Apr 4 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Richard D. Friedman 625 South State Street(734) 647-1078
    Counsel of RecordAnn Arbor, MI  48109
rdfrdman@umich.edu
Party name: Joshua Katso
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543