Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-350
No. 15-350
Title:
Samuel Zook, et al., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:September 21, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-5187)
  Decision Date:April 24, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:June 19, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 17 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2015)
Oct 6 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Environmental Protection Agency, et al. to respond filed.
Oct 14 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015.
Nov 2 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Wallace L. Taylor 118 Third Avenue, SE(319) 366-2428
    Counsel of RecordSuite 326
Cedar Rapids, IA  52401
wtaylorlaw@aol.com
Party name: Samuel Zook, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Environmental Protection Agency, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543