Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-316
No. 15-316
Title:
Schumacher Homes of Circleville, Inc., Petitioner
v.
John Spencer, et ux.
Docketed:September 15, 2015
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia
  Case Nos.:(14-0441)
  Decision Date:April 24, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:June 15, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 14 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2015)
Oct 5 2015 Waiver of right of respondents John Spencer, et ux. to respond filed.
Oct 15 2015 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America.
Oct 21 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015.
Oct 27 2015 Response Requested . (Due November 27, 2015)
Nov 19 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 28, 2015.
Dec 28 2015 Brief of respondents John Spencer, et ux. in opposition filed.
Jan 12 2016 Reply of petitioner Schumaker Homes of Circleville, Inc. filed.
Jan 13 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016.
Feb 29 2016 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America GRANTED.
Feb 29 2016 Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of DIRECTV, Inc. v. Imburgia, 577 U. S. ___ (2015).
Apr 1 2016 MANDATE ISSUED
Apr 1 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Andrew J. Pincus Mayer Brown LLP(202) 263-3127
    Counsel of Record1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC  20006-1101
apincus@mayerbrown.com
Party name: Schumaker Homes of Circleville, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Randall L. Trautwein Lamp, Bartram Levy, Trautwein & Perry, PLLC(304) 523-5400
    Counsel of Record720 Fourth Avenue, P.O. Box 2488
Huntington, WV  25725-2488
rtrautwein@lbltplaw.com
Party name: John Spencer, et ux.
Other:
Thomas Ryan McCarthy Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC703-243-9423
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA  22201
tom@consovoymccarthy.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
May 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2