Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-294
No. 15-294
Title:
Brandon Raub, Petitioner
v.
Michael Campbell
Docketed:September 9, 2015
Linked with 15A58
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1277)
  Decision Date:April 29, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 8 2015 Application (15A58) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2015 to August 26, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 14 2015 Application (15A58) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 26, 2015.
Aug 26 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2015)
Oct 9 2015 Brief of respondent Michael Campbell in opposition filed.
Oct 23 2015 Reply of petitioner Brandon Raub filed.
Oct 28 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015.
Nov 16 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
William H. Hurd Troutman Sanders, LLP(804) 697-1335
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Box 1122
Richmond, VA  23218
william.wurd@troutmansanders.com
Party name: Brandon Raub
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey L. Mincks Office of the County Attorney(804) 748-1491
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Box 40
Chesterfield, VA  23832
mincksj@chesterfield.gov
Party name: Michael Campbell

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543