Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1543
No. 15-1543
Title:
Georgianna Terrell, et al., Petitioners
v.
Janet L. Yellen, Chair, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System
Docketed:June 27, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-5260)
  Decision Date:December 21, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:March 21, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 20 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2016)
Jul 12 2016 Waiver of right of respondent Janet L. Yellen, Chair, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System to respond filed.
Jul 20 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Walter T. Charlton Walter T. Charlton and Associates(410) 571-8764
    Counsel of Record 11213 Angus Way
Woodsboro, MD  21798
charltonwt@comcast.net
Party name: Georgianna Terrell, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Ian Heath Gershengorn Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Janet L. Yellen, Chair, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543