Docket for 15-1507
No. 15-1507 | |
Title: |
Roger Huang, General Partner, on Behalf of HYW Limited Partnership, Petitioner |
v. |
City of Los Angeles, California |
|
Docketed: | June 15, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-55400) |
Decision Date: | February 18, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 12, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 10 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2016) |
Jul 11 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent City of Los Angeles, California to respond filed. |
Jul 27 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Aug 2 2016 |
Response Requested . (Due September 1, 2016) |
Aug 30 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2016. |
Sep 6 2016 |
Brief of respondent City of Los Angeles, California in opposition filed. |
Sep 15 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Roger Huang, General Partner, on Behalf of HYW Limited Partnership filed. |
Sep 21 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 7, 2016. |
Oct 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|