Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1343
No. 15-1343
Title:
Darlene F. Edwards, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cynthia S. Blackman, et al.
Docketed:May 3, 2016
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Maine
  Case Nos.:(Kno-14-358)
  Decision Date:December 31, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:February 1, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 29 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 2, 2016)
May 13 2016 Waiver of right of respondents Cynthia S. Blackman, Nathalie M. Scott, Eliot A. Scott and Constance M. Scott to respond filed.
Jun 15 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
David A. Soley Bernstein Shur(207) 774-1200
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Box 9729
Portland, ME  04104-5029
dsoley@bernsteinshur.com
Party name: Darlene F. Edwards, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Ryan P. Dumais Eaton Peabody(207) 729-1144
    Counsel of Record P.O. Box 9
Brunswick, ME  04011
rdumais@eatonpeabody.com
Party name: Cynthia S. Blackman, Nathalie M. Scott, Eliot A. Scott and Constance M. Scott

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543