Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1257
No. 15-1257     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Hasan K. Akbar, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 8, 2016
Linked with 15A742
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(13-7001)
  Decision Date:August 19, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 13 2016 Application (15A742) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 7, 2016 to April 7, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jan 15 2016 Application (15A742) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 7, 2016.
Apr 6 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2016)
Apr 20 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitiioner.
May 4 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 8, 2016.
May 9 2016 Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
May 9 2016 Brief amicus curiae of National Institute of Military Justice filed.
May 9 2016 Brief amici curiae of United States Air Force and Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Divisions filed.
Jun 3 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 8, 2016.
Jul 6 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 3, 2016.
Aug 3 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 3 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Professor Aditya Bamzai filed.
Aug 17 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Aug 17 2016 Reply of petitioner Hasan K. Akbar filed. (Distributed)
Oct 3 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jennifer K. Beerman Captain, Judge Advocate(703) 693-0651
    Counsel of Record U.S. Army Legal Services Agency,
Defense Appellate Division
9275 Gunston Road
Fort Belvoir, VA  22060
jennifer.k.beerman.mil@mail.mil
Party name: Hasan K. Akbar
Attorneys for Respondent:
Ian Heath Gershengorn Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Aditya Bamzai University of Virginia School of Law(434) 243-0698
Washington, DC  20005
abamzai@virginia.edu
Party name: Professor /Aditya Bamzai
 
Lindsay C. Harrison Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6000
1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
lharrison@jenner.com
Party name: National Institute of Military Justice
 
Brian L. Mizer Senior Appellate Defense Counsel(240) 612-4773
Air Force Appellate Defense Division
1500 West Perimeter Road, Suite 1100
Joint Base Andrews, MD  20762
brian.l.mizer.civ@mail.mil
Party name: United States Air Force and Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Divisions
 
Michael A. Scodro Jenner & Block, LLP(312) 923-2652
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL  60654
mscodro@jenner.com
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543