Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1079
No. 15-1079
Title:
Shane Patrick Land, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 25, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-40035)
  Decision Date:September 29, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:November 25, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 23 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2016)
Mar 2 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Mar 9 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 25, 2016.
Mar 23 2016 Motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received.
Mar 24 2016 Letter of consent to the motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received.
Mar 24 2016 Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Jason Paul Steed Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP(214) 740-1411
    Counsel of Record3232 McKinney Ave.
Suite 1400
Dallas, TX  75204
jsteed@bellnunnally.com
Party name: Shane Patrick Land
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543