Docket for 15-1075
No. 15-1075 | |
Title: |
GEA Process Engineering, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Steuben Foods, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | February 24, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2015-1536, -1537, -1538, -1539, -1540) |
Decision Date: | June 23, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 24, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 22 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2016) |
Mar 17 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 25, 2016. |
Apr 20 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Steuben Foods, Inc. to respond filed. |
May 3 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016. |
May 12 2016 |
Response Requested . (Due June 13, 2016) |
May 27 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 27, 2016. |
Jun 14 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 27, 2016. |
Jul 27 2016 |
Brief of respondent Steuben Foods, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Aug 9 2016 |
Reply of petitioner GEA Process Engineering, Inc. filed. |
Aug 10 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|