Docket for 15-1025
No. 15-1025 | |
Title: |
BriarTek IP, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
DeLorme Publishing Company, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | February 16, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2015-1169, 2015-1241) |
Decision Date: | November 12, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 10 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 17, 2016) |
Feb 17 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent DeLorme Publishing Company, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Feb 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016. |
Mar 14 2016 |
Suggestion of mootness and motion to vacate the judgment of the Court of Appeals filed by petitioner BriarTek IP, Inc. (Distributed) |
Mar 21 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|