Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1002
No. 15-1002
Title:
Aifang Ye, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 4, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-10576)
  Decision Date:July 10, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:December 10, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 4 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 7, 2016)
Mar 3 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 6, 2016.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Interpreting and Translation Professors filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts Association of Court Interpreters, Inc. filed.
Apr 4 2016 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 6, 2016.
May 6 2016 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
May 23 2016 Reply of petitioner Aifang Ye filed.
May 24 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2016.
Jun 13 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
R. Trent McCotter 1099 New York Ave. NW 202-637-6333
    Counsel of RecordSuite 900
Washington, DC  20001
tmccotter@jenner.com
Party name: Aifang Ye
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Patrick G. O'Brien Akin Gump Strauss, Hauer &Feld(214) 969-2800
1700 Pacific Avenue
Suite 4100
Dallas, TX  75201
pobrien@akingump.com
Party name: Interpreting and Translation Professors
 
Paul R.Q. Wolfson Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6000
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Massachusetts Association of Court Interpreters, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543