Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14A65
No. 14A65
Title:
Gary R. Herbert, Governor of Utah, et al., Applicants
v.
JoNell Evans, et al.
Docketed:July 16, 2014
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Utah
  Case Nos.:(2:14-cv-00055)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 16 2014 Application (14A65) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jul 16 2014 Response to application (14A65) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due Friday, July 18, 2014, by 10 a.m. ET.
Jul 17 2014 Response to application from respondent JoNell Evans, et al. filed.
Jul 18 2014 Application (14A65) referred to the Court.
Jul 18 2014 Application (14A65) granted by the Court. The preliminary injunction issued by the United States District Court for the District of Utah, case No. 2:14-cv-00055-DAK, on May 19, 2014, is stayed pending final disposition of the appeal by the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit.
Jul 18 2014 Reply of applicant Gary R. Herbert, Governor of Utah, et al. filed.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Gene C. Schaerr Special Assistant Attorney General(801) 366-0100
350 South State St., #230
Salt Lake City, UT  84114-0856
Party name: Gary R. Herbert, Governor of Utah, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Joshua A. Block ACLU(212)-549-2593
125 Broad Street Floor 18
New York, NY  10004
Party name: JoNell Evans, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543