Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-940
No. 14-940
Title:
Sue Evenwel, et al., Appellants
v.
Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Docketed:February 4, 2015
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Texas
  Case Nos.:(1:14-cv-335)
  Decision Date:November 5, 2014
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 2 2015 Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due March 6, 2015)
Feb 2 2015 Supplemental Appendix of Sue Evenwel, et al., Appellants filed.
Feb 17 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for Sue Evenwel, and Edward Pfenninger.
Feb 20 2015 Order extending time to file response to jurisdictional statement to and including April 6, 2015.
Feb 27 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents
Mar 2 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
Mar 5 2015 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Tennessee State Legislators and The Judicial Education Project filed.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Mar 6 2015 Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc., et al. filed.
Apr 6 2015 Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
Apr 20 2015 Reply of appellants Sue Evenwel, et al., Appellants filed. (Distributed)
Apr 21 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 14, 2015.
May 18 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 21, 2015.
May 26 2015 PROBABLE JURISDICTION NOTED.
Jun 5 2015 The time to file the joint appendix and appellants' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 31, 2015.
Jun 5 2015 The time to file appellees' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 18, 2015.
Jun 9 2015 Consent to the fiing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the appellees.
Jun 10 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from appellants Sue Evenwel and Edward Pfenninger.
Jun 29 2015 Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by appellants Sue Evenwel, et al.
Jul 31 2015 Brief of appellants Sue Evenwel, et al. filed.
Aug 5 2015 Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc. filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Project 21 filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Tennessee State Legislators and The Judicial Education Project filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and Reason Foundation filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amici curiae of Demographers Peter A. Morrison, et al. filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc., et al. filed.
Aug 7 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Yakima, Washington filed.
Sep 14 2015 Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Sep 18 2015 Brief of appellees Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al. filed.
Sep 24 2015 Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of Texas filed.
Sep 24 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Common Cause filed.
Sep 24 2015 Brief amici curiae of Texas Senate Hispanic Caucus, et al. filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Democratic National Committee filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of Former Directors of the U.S. Census Bureau filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of Texas Senators filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Carl E. Heastie in His Official Capacity as Speaker of the New York State Assembly filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of Direct Action for Rights and Equality (DARE), et al. filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The City of New York filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of Hispanic National Bar Association, et al. filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of Children's Defense Fund, et al. filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of Hawaii Reapportionment Case Plaintiffs (David P. Brostrom, Andrew Walden) filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of City of Los Angeles, et al. filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Harris County, Texas filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of Nathaniel Persily, et al. filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed.
Sep 25 2015 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Sep 25 2015 Brief amici curiae of Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al. filed.
Oct 9 2015 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 8, 2015
Oct 19 2015 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 19 2015 Reply of appellants Sue Evenwel, et al. filed.
Oct 19 2015 Record requested from the U.S.D.C. Western District of Texas.
Oct 23 2015 Record received from the U.S.D.C. Western District of Texas is electronic.
Oct 27 2015 CIRCULATED
Dec 8 2015 Argued. For appellants: William S. Consovoy, Arlington, Va. For appellees: Scott A. Keller, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.; and Ian H. Gershengorn, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Apr 4 2016 Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment, in which Thomas, J., joined except as to Part III-B.
May 6 2016 JUDGMENT ISSUED



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Appellants:
William S. Consovoy Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC(703) 243-9423
    Counsel of Record3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA  22201
will@consovoymccarthy.com
Party name: Sue Evenwel, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees:
Scott A. Keller Solicitor General of the State of Texas(512) 936-1700
    Counsel of Record Office of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX  78711-2548
scott.keller@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Party name: Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al.
 
Other:
Jessica Ring Amunson Jenner & Block LLP(202) 639-6000
1099 New York Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20001
jamunson@jenner.com
Party name: Former Directors of the U.S. Census Bureau
 
Robert F. Bauer Perkins Coie LLP(202) 654-6200
700 13th St., N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC  20005
RBauer@perkinscoie.com
Party name: Democratic National Committee
 
Bradley A. Benbrook Benbrook Law Group, PC(916) 447-4900
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1610
Sacramento, CA  95814
brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
Party name: Demographers Peter A. Morrison, et al.
 
Emmet J. Bondurant Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP(404) 881-4100
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA  30309
bondurant@bmelaw.com
Party name: Common Cause
 
G. Eric Brunstad Jr. Dechert LLP(860) 524-3999
90 State House Square
Hartford, CT  06103
eric.brunstad@dechert.com
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
 
David R. Carpenter Sidley Austin, LLP(213) 896-6679
555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA  90013
drcarpenter@sidley.com
Party name: Children's Defense Fund, et al.
 
Zachary W. Carter Corporation Counsel of the City of New York(212) 356-2500
100 Church Street
New York, NY  10007
rdearing@law.nyc.gov
Party name: The City of New York
 
C. Daniel Chill Graubard Miller(212) 818-8800
405 Lexington Ave., 11th Fl.
New York, NY  10174
dchill@graubard.com
Party name: Carl E. Heastie in His Official Capacity as Speaker of the New York State Assembly
 
Walter Dellinger O'Melveny & Myers LLP(202) 383-5319
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
wdellinger@omm.com
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
 
Gregory L. Diskant Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP(212) 336-2000
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
gldiskant@pbwt.com
Party name: City of Los Angeles, et al.
 
Chad W. Dunn Brazil & Dunn LLP(281) 580-6310
4201 Cypress Creek Pkwy., Suite 530
Houston, TX  77068
chad@brazilanddunn.com
Party name: Texas Senators
 
John C. Eastman Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(877) 855-3330
c/o Chapman University School of Law
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92866
jeastman@chapman.edu
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
 
Peter J. Ferrara 20594 Woodmere Court(703)-582-8466
Sterling, VA  20165
peterferrara@msn.com
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
 
Francis S. Floyd Floyd Plueger & Ringer PS(206)-441-4455
200 W. Thomas Street Suite 500
Seattle, WA  98119
ffloyd@floyd-ringer.com
Party name: Yakima, Washington
 
Ian Heath Gershengorn Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@usdoj.gov
Party name: United States
 
Shannon Lee Goessling Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.(770) 977-2131
2255 Sewell Mill Rd., Suite 320
Marietta, GA  30062
shannon@southeasternlegal.org
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
 
C. Robert Heath Bickerstaff Heath Delgado Acosta LLP(512) 472-8021
3711 S. MoPac Expressway
Building One; Suite 300
Austin, TX  78746
bheath@bickerstaff.com
Party name: Harris County, Texas
 
Matthew Michael Hoffman Goodwin Procter LLP(202)-346-4000
901 New York Avenue N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
mhoffman@goodwinprocter.com
Party name: Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al.
 
Lawrence J. Joseph 1250 Connecticut Ave., NW(202) 355-9452
Suite 200
Washington, DC  20036
lj@larryjoseph.com
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund, Inc.
 
Peter Karanjia Davis Wright Tremaine LLP(202) 973-4200
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 800
Washington, DC  20006
peterkaranjia@dwt.com
Party name: Hispanic National Bar Association, et al.
 
Steven J. Lechner Mountain States Legal Foundation(303) 292-2021
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO  80227
lechner@mountainstateslegal.com
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
 
John J. Park Jr. Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP(678) 347-2208
1170 Peachtree Street NE, Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA  30309
jjp@sbllaw.net
Party name: Tennessee State Legislators and The Judicial Education Project
 
Nina Perales Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund(210) 224-5476
110 Broadway, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX  78205
nperales@maldef.org
Party name: Texas Senate Hispanic Caucus, et al.
 
Nathaniel Persily Stanford Law School(917) 570-3223
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA  94305
npersily@law.stanford.edu
Party name: Nathaniel Persily, et al.
 
Kaylan Lytle Phillips Public Interest Legal Foudation317-203-5599
209 West Main Street
Plainfield, IN  46168
kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
 
Robert D. Popper Judicial Watch, Inc.(202) 646-5172
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC  20024
rpopper@judicialwatch.org
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc., et al.
 
David B. Rivkin Jr. Baker & Hostetler LLP(202) 861-1731
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC  20036
drivkin@bakerlaw.com
Party name: Project 21
 
Sidney S. Rosdeitcher Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP(212) 373-3000
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10019-6064
srosdeitcher@paulweiss.com
Party name: The Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law
 
Ilya Shapiro Cato Institute(202) 842-0200
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC  20001
ishapiro@cato.org
Party name: Cato Institute and Reason Foundation
 
Robert H. Thomas Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert(808) 531-8031
1003 Bishop Street, 1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI  96813
rht@hawaiilawyer.com
Party name: Hawaii Reapportionment Case Plaintiffs (David P. Brostrom, Andrew Walden)
 
Barbara D. Underwood Solicitor General(212) 416-8020
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway, 25th Floor
New York, NY  10271-0332
barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
Party name: New York, et al.
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: the United States
 
Dale L. Wilcox Immigration Reform Law Institute(202) 232-5590
25 Massachsetts Ave., NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC  20001
litigation@irli.com
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
 
Brenda Wright DEMOS(617) 232-5885
358 Chestnut Hill Avenue, Suite 303
Brighton, MA  02135
bwright@demos.org
Party name: Direct Action for Rights and Equality (DARE), et al.
 
Elizabeth B. Wydra Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th St., N.W., Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
 
Sean J. Young American Civil Liberties Union Foundation(212) 549-2500
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY  10004
syoung@aclu.org
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of Texas
August 28, 2016 | Version 2014.2