Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-933
No. 14-933
Title:
Tracy A. Fair, Petitioner
v.
Robert Walker, et al.
Docketed:February 3, 2015
Lower Ct:Court of Special Appeals of Maryland
  Case Nos.:(1287, September Term, 2012)
  Decision Date:April 7, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:May 14, 2014
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:August 28, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:November 20, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 2 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2015)
Feb 6 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Robert Walker, et al. to respond filed.
Mar 18 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 3, 2015.
Apr 6 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Tracy A. Fair 19 W Obrecht Road(410) 552-5907
Sykesville, MD  21784
Party name: Tracy A. Fair
Attorneys for Respondents:
Steven M. Sullivan Assistant Attorney General(410) 576-6325
    Counsel of Record Office of the Attorney General
200 Saint Paul Place
20th Floor
Baltimore, MD  21202
ssullivan@oag.state.md.us
Party name: Robert Walker, et al.
July 24, 2016 | Version 2014.1