Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-8466
No. 14-8466
Title:
John David Kennard, Petitioner
v.
City of Ashland, Kentucky, et al.
Docketed:February 19, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-5246)
  Decision Date:September 26, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:November 17, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 14 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 23, 2015)
Mar 18 2015 Brief of respondent City of Ashland, Kentucky in opposition filed.
Mar 18 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Boyd County, Kentucky to respond filed.
Apr 2 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015.
Apr 20 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
John Kennard 5238 Skyline Drive
Ashland, KY  41102
Party name: John David Kennard
Attorneys for Respondents:
Phillip Bruce Leslie McBrayer, McGinnis, Leslie & Kirkland, PLLC(606) 473-7303
    Counsel of Record402 Main Street, Ste. 2, P.O. Box 280
Greenup, KY  41144-0280
Party name: Boyd County, Kentucky
 
James H. Moore II. Campbell Woods, PLLC(606) 329-1974
    Counsel of RecordP.O. Box 1862
Ashland, KY  41105-1862
jmoore@campbellwoods.com
Party name: City of Ashland, Kentucky
March 24, 2017 | Version 2014.2