Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-826
No. 14-826
Title:
John Albert Dummett, Jr., et al., Petitioners
v.
Alex Padilla, California Secretary of State, et al.
Docketed:January 13, 2015
Linked with 14A720
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Third Appellate District
  Case Nos.:(C073763, C071764)
  Decision Date:July 21, 2014
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:October 15, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 2 2015 Application (14A720) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 13, 2015 to February 12, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jan 7 2015 Application (14A720) denied by Justice Kennedy.
Jan 13 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2015)
Feb 11 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Alejandro Padilla as California's Secretary of States to respond filed.
Mar 4 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015.
Mar 23 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
William J. Olson William J.Olson, P.C.(703) 356-5070
    Counsel of Record370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180-5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: John Albert Dummett, Jr., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Anthony R. Hakl Department of Justice(916) 322-9041
    Counsel of Record1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
Party name: Alex Padilla, California Secretary of State, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543