Docket for 14-667
No. 14-667 | |
Title: |
Michael J. Dee, Petitioner |
v. |
Maine |
|
Docketed: | December 5, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Judicial Court of Maine |
Case Nos.: | (Cum-13-496) |
Decision Date: | August 14, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 30, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 25 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 5, 2015) |
Dec 10 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Maine to respond filed. |
Dec 30 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2015. |
Jan 20 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|