Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-596
No. 14-596
Title:
Jonathan P. Robicheaux, et al., Petitioners
v.
Devin George, in His Official Capacity as Louisiana State Registrar and Center Director at Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, et al.
Docketed:November 24, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-31037)
Rule 11

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 20 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due December 24, 2014)
Dec 2 2014 Brief of respondents Devin George, in His Official Capacity as Louisiana State Registrar and Center Director at Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, et al. in support filed.
Dec 3 2014 Letter of December 2, 2014, from counsel for petitioners waiving 14-day waiting period pursuant to Rule 15.5.
Dec 15 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Idaho Governor C.L."Butch" Otter filed. VIDED.
Dec 15 2014 Brief amici curiae of 76 Scholars of Marriage filed. VIDED.
Dec 16 2014 Brief amici curiae of Colage Equality Federation, et al. filed.
Dec 17 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Jan 12 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kenneth D. Upton Jr. Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. (214) 219-8585
    Counsel of Record3500 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 500
Dallas, TX  75219
kupton@lambdalegal.org
Party name: Jonathan P. Robicheaux, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
S. Kyle Duncan Duncan PLLC(202) 714-9492
    Counsel of Record1629 K Street, N.W., Suite 300
Washington, DC  20006
kduncan@duncanpllc.com
Party name: Devin George, in His Official Capacity as Louisiana State Registrar and Center Director at Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, et al.
Other:
Gene C. Schaerr Law Offices of Gene C. Schaerr(202) 361-1061
332 Constitution Avenue NE
Washington, DC  20002
gschaerr@gmail.com
Party name: Idaho Governor C.L."Butch" Otter
 
Gene Clayton Schaerr 332 Constitution Avenue NE (202)-361-1061
Washington, DC  20002
gschaerr@gmail.com
Party name: 76 Scholars of Marriage
 
Jeffrey S. Trachtman Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP(212) 715-9100
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY  10036
jtrachtman@kramerlevin.com
Party name: Colage Equality Federation, et al.
December 09, 2016 | Version 2014.2