Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-5551
No. 14-5551
Title:
David Gerard Jeep, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 1, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1470)
  Decision Date:June 5, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:July 8, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jul 21 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 1, 2014)
Aug 25 2014 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Aug 28 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014.
Oct 6 2014 Petition DENIED.
Oct 24 2014 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Nov 3 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 25, 2014.
Dec 1 2014 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David G. Jeep General Delivery(314) 514-5228
Saint Louis, MO  63155-9999
Dave@DGJeep.com
Party name: David Gerard Jeep
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2