Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-505
No. 14-505
Title:
Daniel Brewington, Petitioner
v.
Indiana
Docketed:November 3, 2014
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Indiana
  Case Nos.:(15S01-1405-CR-309)
  Decision Date:May 1, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:July 31, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 29 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2014)
Nov 25 2014 Waiver of right of respondent Indiana to respond filed.
Dec 10 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
Jan 12 2015 Petition DENIED.
Feb 4 2015 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Feb 11 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 27, 2015.
Mar 2 2015 Rehearing DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Daniel P. Brewington 2529 Sheridan Drive(513) 383-3136
Norwood, OH  45212
contactdanbrewington@gmail.com
Party name: Daniel Brewington
Attorneys for Respondent:
Stephen R. Creason Chief Counsel(317) 232-6222
    Counsel of Record Office of Attorney General
IGCS, 5th Floor
302 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN  46204
Party name: Indiana
September 24, 2016 | Version 2014.2