Docket for 14-428
No. 14-428 | |
Title: |
Robert Thayer, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
City of Worcester, Massachusetts |
|
Docketed: | October 14, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-2355) |
Decision Date: | June 19, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 17, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 14 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2014) |
Nov 12 2014 |
Brief of respondent City of Worcester, Massachusetts in opposition filed. |
Nov 13 2014 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Homeless Empowerment Project. |
Nov 24 2014 |
Reply of petitioners Robert Thayer, et al. filed. |
Dec 3 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jun 22 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015. |
Jun 29 2015 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Homeless Empowerment Project GRANTED. |
Jun 29 2015 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Reed v. Town of Gilbert, 576 U. S. ___ (2015). |
Jul 31 2015 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|