Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-1519
No. 14-1519
Title:
Aaron M. Buford, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 24, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(14-6010)
  Decision Date:March 24, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jun 22 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2015)
Jul 2 2015 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jul 8 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Oct 5 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Christopher D. James Air Force Appellate Defense Division(240) 612-4770
    Counsel of Record1500 West Perimeter Road, Suite 1100
Joint Base Andrews, MD  20762
Party name: Aaron M. Buford
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543