Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-1408
No. 14-1408     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Lester Leroy Bower, Petitioner
v.
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:May 29, 2015
Linked with 14A1218
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-40032, 15-70003)
  Decision Date:May 21, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 29 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 29, 2015)
May 29 2015 Application (14A1218) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Scalia.
Jun 1 2015 Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed.
Jun 2 2015 Reply of petitioner Lester Leroy Bower filed.
Jun 3 2015 Application (14A1218) referred to the Court.
Jun 3 2015 Petition DENIED.
Jun 3 2015 Application (14A1218) denied by the Court.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Peter Buscemi Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP(202) 739-5190
    Counsel of Record1111 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC  20004
pbuscemi@morganlewis.com
Party name: Lester Leroy Bower
Attorneys for Respondent:
Stephen M. Hoffman Assistant Attorney General(512) 936-1400
Postconviction Litigation Division
Post Office Box 12548
Austin, TX  78711-2548
stephen.hoffman@texasattorneygeneral.gov.
Party name: William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543