Docket for 14-135
No. 14-135 | |
Title: |
Madelyn Haines and Paul Zamrowski, Petitioners |
v. |
Arthur E. Lange Revocable Trust, et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 6, 2014 |
Linked with 14A109 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-3899, 11-3923, 11-4022, 11-4030) |
Decision Date: | April 3, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 27, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 23 2014 |
Application (14A109) to recall and stay pending disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Jul 23 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2014) |
Jul 23 2014 |
Supplemental Appendix of Madelyn Haines and Paul Zamrowski filed. |
Jul 29 2014 |
Application (14A109) denied by Justice Ginsburg. |
Aug 18 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Arthur Brainson, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 20 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Tremont Partners, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 22 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Arthur E. Lange Revocable Trust, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 22 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Eastham Capital Appreciation Fund LP, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 23 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 25 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Chateau Fiduciaire S.A., et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 26 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Oppenheimer Acquisition Corp. to respond filed. |
Aug 27 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondents Rye Select Broad Market Fund, L.P., et al. to respond filed. |
Sep 10 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | | |
Robert Rache Elarbee |
130 W. Wieuca Road, Suite 102 | 404-851-0096 |
| Atlanta, GA 30342 | |
| relarbee@elarbeelaw.com |
Party name: Madelyn Haines and Paul Zamrowski |
Attorneys for Respondents: | | |
Andrew J. Entwistle |
280 Park Avenue | (212) 894-7200 |
Counsel of Record | 26th Floor West | |
| New York, NY 10017 | |
| aentwistle@entwistle-law.com |
Party name: Arthur E. Lange Revocable Trust, et al. |
| | |
Jeffrey M. Haber |
Bernstein Liebhard, LLP | (212) 779-1414 |
Counsel of Record | 10 East 40th Street | |
| New York, NY 10016 | |
| haber@bernlieb.com |
Party name: Arthur Brainson, et al. |
| | |
Carol E. Head |
Bingham & McCutchen, LLP | (617) 951-8000 |
Counsel of Record | One Federal Street | |
| Boston, MA 02110 | |
| carol.head@bingham.com |
Party name: Eastham Capital Appreciation Fund LP, et al. |
| | |
David A. Kotler |
Dechert LLP | (212) 698-3500 |
Counsel of Record | 1095 Avenue of the Americas | |
| New York, NY 10036 | |
| david.kotler@dechert.com |
Party name: Oppenheimer Acquisition Corp. |
| | |
Daniel W. Krasner |
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP | (212) 545-4600 |
Counsel of Record | 270 Madison Avenue | |
| New York, NY 10016 | |
| krasner@whafh.com |
Party name: Chateau Fiduciaire S.A., et al. |
| | |
Seth M. Schwartz |
Skadden, Arps, Meagher & Flom LLP | (212) 735-3000 |
Counsel of Record | Four Times Square, 42nd Floor | |
| New York, NY 10036 | |
Party name: Tremont Partners, Inc., et al. |
| | |
Jamie B. W. Stecher |
Tannenbaum, Helpern, Syracuse & Hirschtritt, LLP | (212) 508-6738 |
Counsel of Record | 900 Third Avenue | |
| New York, NY 10022-4775 | |
| stecher@thshlaw.com |
Party name: Rye Select Broad Market Fund, L.P., et al. |