Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-1253
No. 14-1253
Title:
Anna Cladakis, Petitioner
v.
Sherrie Allison Miller
Docketed:April 17, 2015
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Mississippi
  Case Nos.:(2012-CA-01198-COA)
  Decision Date:June 17, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:October 14, 2014
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:January 15, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 15 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2015)
May 4 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Hooters of America, LLC to respond filed.
May 4 2015 Waiver of right of respondents Provident Advertising and Marketing, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
May 18 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Sherrie Allison Miller to respond filed.
Jun 2 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 18, 2015.
Jun 22 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Stevan L. Black Black McLarne Jones, Ryland & Griffee, P.C.(901) 762-0535
    Counsel of Record530 Oak Court Drive
Suite 360
Memphis, TN  38177
sblack@blackmclaw.com
Party name: Anna Cladakis
Attorneys for Respondent:
Drayton D. Berkley Berkley Law Firm, PLLC(901) 322-8706
    Counsel of Record119 South Main, Ste. 500
Menphis, TN  38103
attorneyberkley@gmail.com
Party name: Sherrie Allison Miller
 
Emil Eugene Thornton III. Evans Petree, P.C.(901) 525-6781
    Counsel of Record1000 Ridgeway Loop Rd., Suite 200
Memphis, TN  38120
Party name: Provident Advertising and Marketing, Inc., et al.
 
Stanford Glenn Wilson Elarbee, Thompson, Sapp & Wilson(404) 659-6700
    Counsel of Record800 Peachtree, Cain Tower
229 Peachtree Street, N.E.
Atlanta, GA  30303
Party name: Hooters of America, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543